RI H7123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a dealer to provide self-sealing tires as a substitute for a jack and spare tire when selling a new or used automobile.
Title
Spare Tire Or Equivalent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-03-06 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/30/2018) |
2018-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |