RI H7112 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Allows the waiver of interest on overdue taxes for commercial properties.
Title
Allows the waiver of interest on overdue taxes for commercial properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee on Municipal Government & Housing: Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-02-29 | House | House read and passed |
2024-02-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2024) |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |