RI H7109 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TOWNS AND CITIES -- REDEVELOPMENT PROJECTS - Adds the city of Central Falls as exempt from taxation for property acquired by an agency for redevelopment purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds the city of Central Falls as exempt from taxation for property acquired by an agency for redevelopment purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-29HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2024-06-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2024-06-13SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2024-06-12SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2024)
2024-06-12HouseHouse read and passed
2024-06-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2024)
2024-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2024-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2024)
2024-02-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024)
2024-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback