RI H7099 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a sales tax holiday for the days of August 11, 2018 and August 12, 2018 and no sales taxes would be collected on non-business sales of tangible personal property with certain exceptions.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7099.pdf |