RI H7095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits minors and persons under the age of twenty-one (21) years old from engaging in any type of legal casino gambling and be subject to civil penalties for violation.
Title
Casino Gaming
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7095.pdf |