RI H7087 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Children (would Include Various Forms Of Cigars, Flavored Cigars, Flavored And Unflavored Blunt Wraps And Rolling Papers As Items Subject To The Restrictions Which Prohibits The Sale Of Certain Tobacco Products To Minors)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Children (would Include Various Forms Of Cigars, Flavored Cigars, Flavored And Unflavored Blunt Wraps And Rolling Papers As Items Subject To The Restrictions Which Prohibits The Sale Of Certain Tobacco Products To Minors)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-06-04 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7087.pdf |