RI H7085 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of New England Bible Doctrine Church
Title
VACATE THE FORFEITURE OR REVOCATION OF THE CHARTER OF NEW ENGLAND BIBLE DOCTRINE CHURCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-02-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/15/2024) |
2024-01-30 | House | House read and passed |
2024-01-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/30/2024) |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |