RI H7081 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of the Student Loan Ombudsman within the Division of Higher Education Assistance. The Ombudsman's duties would be to assist student loan borrowers with issues pertaining to their loans.
Title
The Student Loan Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7081.pdf |