RI H7080 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Rhode Island Certification Standards Board (would Add Two Members Of The Aicu Rhode Island To The Policy Advisory Board On Teacher And Administrator Certification.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Rhode Island Certification Standards Board (would Add Two Members Of The Aicu Rhode Island To The Policy Advisory Board On Teacher And Administrator Certification.)
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-29 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-23 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-02-15 | House read and passed | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on House Calendar (02/15/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-02-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7080.pdf |