RI H7058 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend and create new zoning code definitions concerning board/rooming houses and related types of residential occupancy arrangements, which would enable their local regulation
Title
Rooming--boarding Houses
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2014) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7058.pdf |