RI H7055 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections (would Increase The No. Of Active Voters Served By The Same Polling Place / Local Election Board Can Increase The No. Of Voters At A Single Voting Place Above The Voter Limit As Long As The Effect Would Not Result In A Voting Place Serving Less Voters)
Title
An Act Relating To Elections (would Increase The No. Of Active Voters Served By The Same Polling Place / Local Election Board Can Increase The No. Of Voters At A Single Voting Place Above The Voter Limit As Long As The Effect Would Not Result In A Voting Place Serving Less Voters)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-04-11 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-04-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/11/2012) | |
2012-03-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-03-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2012) | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | House read and passed | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on House Calendar (02/02/2012) | |
2012-01-31 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2012) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7055.pdf |