RI H7054 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act In Accordance With Rhode Island General Laws Section 16-7-44 Approving The Issuance Of $700,000 Bonds By The Town Of Portsmouth To Finance Improvements To School Buildings Including But Not Limited To Bonds And Notes Issued Pursuant To Financing Agreements With The Rhode Island Health And Educational Building Corporation (would Serve As The Enabling Act Required By Ri General Laws Section 16-7-44 In Order For The Principal And Interest On Bonds Issued In Support Of School Housing Projects To Be Eligible For State Housing Aid Reimbursement.)
Title
An Act In Accordance With Rhode Island General Laws Section 16-7-44 Approving The Issuance Of $700,000 Bonds By The Town Of Portsmouth To Finance Improvements To School Buildings Including But Not Limited To Bonds And Notes Issued Pursuant To Financing Agreements With The Rhode Island Health And Educational Building Corporation (would Serve As The Enabling Act Required By Ri General Laws Section 16-7-44 In Order For The Principal And Interest On Bonds Issued In Support Of School Housing Projects To Be Eligible For State Housing Aid Reimbursement.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/24/2012) | |
2012-04-12 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-04-10 | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2012) | |
2012-04-03 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-03-13 | House read and passed | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on House Calendar (03/13/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2012) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7054.pdf |