RI H7047 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES ACT - Amends the current law on controlled substances to permit a person to be in possession of less than one ounce of psilocybin and permits psilocybin to be securely cultivated within a person's residence for personal use.
Title
Amends the current law on controlled substances to permit a person to be in possession of less than one ounce of psilocybin and permits psilocybin to be securely cultivated within a person's residence for personal use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7047.pdf |