RI H7045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems (would Require Towns And Cities To Change Auditors Or Auditing Firms Every Three Years.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems (would Require Towns And Cities To Change Auditors Or Auditing Firms Every Three Years.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] |
Rep. John Savage [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2012) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7045.pdf |