RI H7044 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Miceli Construction & Roofing, Inc
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Miceli Construction & Roofing, Inc
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-20 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-03-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/01/2016) |
2016-01-20 | House | House read and passed |
2016-01-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/20/2016) |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/12/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |