RI H7034 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates arming campus police at public higher educational institutions and includes campus police in the definition of "law enforcement officer" for the purposes of the "Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights."
Title
Maintenance Of Order On Campus -- See Title 16 Chapter 97 -- The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Meeting postponed (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7034.pdf |