RI H7033 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES - Provides the executive office of health and human services would submit to the US Department of Health and Human Services a state plan to set rates for chiropractic services.
Title
Provides the executive office of health and human services would submit to the US Department of Health and Human Services a state plan to set rates for chiropractic services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/15/2024) |
2024-04-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/01/2024) |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Human Services
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7033.pdf |