RI H7032 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- AWARD OF MUNICIPAL CONTRACTS - Increases the maximum state and municipal small purchase limits from $10,000 to $25,000 for construction projects and from $5,000 to $10,000 for all other state and municipal purchases.
Title
Increases the maximum state and municipal small purchase limits from $10,000 to $25,000 for construction projects and from $5,000 to $10,000 for all other state and municipal purchases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2024-06-11 | House | House read and passed |
2024-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/07/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |