RI H7031 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act.
Title
Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2014-02-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-02-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/11/2014) |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/04/2014) |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2014) |
2014-01-21 | House | Meeting postponed (01/21/2014) |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |