RI H7026 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- TEACHERS' RETIREMENT - Requires all public school teachers hired on or after July 1, 2024, to participate in the retirement system social security pursuant to chapter 7 of title 36.
Title
Requires all public school teachers hired on or after July 1, 2024, to participate in the retirement system social security pursuant to chapter 7 of title 36.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7026.pdf |