RI H7021 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain ancillary services provided to customers of rental companies which companies directly or indirectly use Warwick Station or the T.F. Green state airport, from certain charges imposed by the RI Airport Corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airports And Landing Fields

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-03-12HouseMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-06HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/06/2018)
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback