RI H7016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of East Greenwich to exempt from the restriction on liquor licenses within two hundred feet (200') of a school or place of worship any proposed Class B or C license located in a Commercial CD-1 zone.
Title
Retail Licenses--town Of East Greenwich
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/14/2016) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |