RI H7010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a minor technical correction to what is included in a service contract for the repair and replacement of tires.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/05/2020) |
2020-02-04 | House | House read and passed |
2020-01-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |