RI H7010 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses (would Make Assault On A Pregnant Woman Which Causes Her To Suffer A Miscarriage Or Stillbirth Punishable By Up To Thirty Years Imprisonment, And Life Imprisonment If The Fetus Is 12 Weeks Or Older.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses (would Make Assault On A Pregnant Woman Which Causes Her To Suffer A Miscarriage Or Stillbirth Punishable By Up To Thirty Years Imprisonment, And Life Imprisonment If The Fetus Is 12 Weeks Or Older.)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
Rep. John Savage [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7010.pdf |