RI H6656 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-6004 Sub A as amended --Entitles disabled and military voters to utilize electronically transmitted ballots.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |