RI H6614 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5554 --Makes it a felony for an individual to possess any semi-automatic firearm magazine which is capable of holding more than 10 rounds of ammunition. Violation is punishable by up to 5 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $5,000.
Title
Large Capacity Feeding Device Ban Of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 26 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 21 N: 45 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 21 N: 46 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 25 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 24 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 26 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 21 N: 45 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 21 N: 46 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 25 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-10 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 24 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2022) |
2022-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |