RI H6460 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Christopher B. Maselli to join Lisa M. Rocchio and Lorenzo Marinelli in marriage on or about September 10, 2021, within the Town of Cumberland, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |