RI H6404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Edward J. Corcoran to join Michelle Davis and Krystal Curtin in marriage on or about October 26, 2021, within the Town of Middletown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |