RI H6388 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the renewable ready program which is designed to promote responsible siting and development of renewable energy on certain enumerated sites such as formerly contaminated sites. Projects would be funded through the infrastructure bank.
Title
Renewable Ready Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6388.pdf |