RI H6355 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows users of telecommunications services to retain, within the same area code, existing phone numbers without impairment of quality, reliability, or convenience when switching from one telecommunications service provider to another.
Title
Telephone Number Portability
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6355.pdf |