RI H6323 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes weekends and state holidays from the calculation of the forty-eight (48) hour public notice requirement, and requires all public bodies to keep minutes of open meetings and file their minutes with the secretary of state.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |