RI H6318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision of chapter 33.6 of title 44 which grants tax credits to individuals or companies redeveloping historic structures.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6318.pdf |