RI H6310 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Budget Commissions
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Budget Commissions
Sponsors
Rep. Helio Melo [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Lisa Baldelli-Hunt [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6310.pdf |