RI H6306 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Methods For Growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island Through Coordinated Branding And Marketing Efforts
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Methods For Growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island Through Coordinated Branding And Marketing Efforts
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee continued |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-06-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |