RI H6305 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the climate change coordinating council to study a carbon pricing program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resilient Rhode Island Act Of 2014 - Climate Change Coordinating Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18HouseSigned by Governor
2017-07-13HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-29SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017)
2017-06-27HouseHouse read and passed
2017-06-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
2017-06-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-06-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2017)
2017-06-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback