RI H6282 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gives the ambulance service coordinating board approval powers over regulations, protocols, standards, licensing fees and other administrative actions set proposed by the director of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Transportation Services--ambulance Service Coordinating Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2021-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2021)
2021-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2021)
2021-06-14HouseCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2021-06-11HouseProposed Substitute
2021-06-11HouseScheduled for hearing (06/14/2021)
2021-05-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021)
2021-04-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback