MA S2859 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2441
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in the town of Topsfield, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2859).
Title
Relative to the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in the town of Topsfield
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Sally Kerans [D] | Rep. Kristin Kassner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-07-11 | Senate | New draft of S2441 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2441 (Replaces) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2859
S2858 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2497 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2860
S2818 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
S2858 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2497 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2860
S2818 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2859 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2859.pdf |