RI H6280 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting & Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Ri From December 31, 2012, To December 31, 2013,& Said Commission Would Expire On February 27, 2014.)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island (extends The Reporting & Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Ri From December 31, 2012, To December 31, 2013,& Said Commission Would Expire On February 27, 2014.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6280.pdf |