RI H6275 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a court shall decide cases without deference to administrative agency interpretation of rules.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/18/2023) |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6275.pdf |