RI H6272 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Daniel Genannt to join Ashley Genannt and Brendan Foley in marriage on or about November 6, 2021, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2021-06-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-01SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/01/2021)
2021-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2021)
2021-05-20SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-05-19HouseHouse read and passed
2021-05-14HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (05/19/2021)
2021-05-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2021)
2021-04-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback