RI H6255 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Under RI Works program, amends definition of dependent child, exclude veteran’s disability pension benefits from determination of family resources or income when determining eligibility for the RI Works program, extends child care assistance.
Title
The Rhode Island Works Program
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6255.pdf |