RI H6249 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases partial unemployment benefits by disregarding an amount of earnings when calculating weekly benefit rate with expiration date of 6/30/22.
Title
Employment Security -- General Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2021-05-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2021) |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |