RI H6248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates paycheck protection program for small businesses of with 50 employees or less for forgivable loans of $50,000 or less modeled on federal program with sunset date of 6/30/2022.
Title
Small Business Assistance Program
Sponsors
Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6248.pdf |