RI H6216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the rental, lease, or finance of any sale of a cat or dog, with exceptions for animals used for breeding, shows and work.
Title
Animal Care
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |