RI H6191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain residential units on lots in the Preserve at Boulder Hills in Richmond from being considered as year-round housing units when calculating the number of low- and moderate-income housing units.
Title
Relating Towns And Cities -- Low- And Moderate-income Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6191.pdf |