RI H6189 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Tuition Waiver Program for Children in Rhode Island Foster Care program.
Title
Tuition Waiver Program For Children In Rhode Island Foster Care
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/20/2023) |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6189.pdf |