RI H6182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Characterizes incentive payments to utilities as billed distribution revenue for rate setting services.
Title
Regulatory Powers Of Administration--utilities
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6182.pdf |