RI H6177 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allows for the growth and sale of hemp as an agricultural product subject to registration as cultivator with the division of agriculture, while sales, storage and growth of hemp products would be under the regulation of the department of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cbd-rich Hemp Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2015-06-18HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2015-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/18/2015)
2015-06-16HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/16/2015)
2015-06-11HouseMeeting postponed (06/11/2015)
2015-06-05HouseScheduled for consideration
2015-05-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-05-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2015)
2015-05-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback