RI H6174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As "the Task Force On The Education Of Children And Youth In The Care Of The Department Of Children, Youth, And Families"
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As "the Task Force On The Education Of Children And Youth In The Care Of The Department Of Children, Youth, And Families"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-22 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-21 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-21 | House read and passed | |
2011-06-15 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-15 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H6174.pdf |