RI H6157 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the town of Smithfield from the provisions of ยงยง 44-5-20.05, 44-5-20.06, 44-5-20.07, and 44-5-20.08, in regard to property tax classification and tax levy determinations.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |